Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Mosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276)
Title
Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB0725)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB1292)
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0161 (SB0096/CH0320) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Mosby 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0557 (SB0509/CH0276) Property Tax - In Rem Foreclosure and Sale - Vacant and Abandoned Property Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1292 (SB0725) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0096 /CH0320 (HB0161) Baltimore City - Tax Sales of Real Property - Water Liens (Water Taxpayer Protection Act of 2019) Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB1292) Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM