Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Tax Sales

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0117)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0075
Title
Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1050
Title
Tax Sales – Notices
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0087
Title
Tax - Property - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1221
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1222
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0058)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0108
Title
Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0117) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0252 /CH0075 Tax Sales – Owner–Occupied Residential Property Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction PG 413-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1050 Tax Sales – Notices Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1182 /CH0087 Tax - Property - Tax Sales Delegate Kipke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Owner-Occupied Residential Property Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1219 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1221 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water and Sewer Liens Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1222 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Notice Requirements Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 (HB0058) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 /CH0108 Tax Sales – Redemption – Nondelinquent Taxes Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 108
Budget and Taxation
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:22 PM
Click to return on the top page