Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Television -see also- Cable Television

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332)
Title
Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1276 /CH0332 (SB0716/CH0331) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 332
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1492 Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 /CH0331 (HB1276/CH0332) Child Care Centers - Healthy Eating and Physical Activity Act Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 331
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM
Click to return on the top page