Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Television -see also- Cable Television

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753 (SB0905/CH0486)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1104 /CH0296
Title
Procurement Exemptions - Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Repacking Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0323
Title
Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0905 /CH0486 (HB0753)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0219 Independent Expenditures and Electioneering Communications - Registration and Reporting Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 (SB0905/CH0486) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1104 /CH0296 Procurement Exemptions - Maryland Public Broadcasting Commission - Repacking Requirements Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Health and Government Operations
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0323 Public Safety - Hit and Run Suspects - Yellow Alert Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0905 /CH0486 (HB0753) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2015 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM