Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0862
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884
Title
Income Tax Credit - Nonpublic Education Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1262 (SB0633)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271
Title
Income Tax Credit - Home Instruction Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0633 (HB1262)
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sale of Textbooks - Audits
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - School Supplies and Textbooks Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0063 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - University and College Textbooks Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0862 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0884 Income Tax Credit - Nonpublic Education Expenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1262 (SB0633) Maryland Education Credit Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 Income Tax Credit - Home Instruction Expenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0633 (HB1262) Maryland Education Credit Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
SB1098 Public Institutions of Higher Education - Sale of Textbooks - Audits Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM