Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875 (SB0665)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405
Title
Maryland Education Credit
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0875)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0487 Maryland Education Credit Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0875 (SB0665) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 Maryland Education Credit Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 (HB0875) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM