Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Textbooks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0092
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0318 /CH0165 (SB0667/CH0166)
Title
University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0811
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - School Supplies and Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1552 (SB0418)
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 (HB1552)
Title
Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0667 /CH0166 (HB0318/CH0165)
Title
University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0092 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0318 /CH0165 (SB0667/CH0166) University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 165
Appropriations
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0811 Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Period for Back-to-School Shopping - School Supplies and Textbooks Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1552 (SB0418) Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
SB0418 (HB1552) Education Savings Account Program - Established Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0667 /CH0166 (HB0318/CH0165) University System of Maryland – Textbooks – Availability of Free or Low–Cost Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020) Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 166
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/11/2020 4:12 PM