Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0571
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House Renovations
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0582 (SB0308)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 (SB0597)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743)
Title
Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013
Sponsor
Baltimore City Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0982 (SB0095)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theatre
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0641)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 (SB1027)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359 (SB0903)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School Auditorium
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 (HB0982)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theatre
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0308 (HB0582)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 (HB0609)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1085)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB1359)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School Auditorium
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1027 (HB1226)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0571 Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Havre de Grace Opera House Renovations Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
HB0582 (SB0308) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric Delegate Jones 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB0609 (SB0597) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0860 /CH0647 (SB0743) Baltimore City Public Schools Construction and Revitalization Act of 2013 Baltimore City Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 647
Appropriations
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0982 (SB0095) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theatre Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0641) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1226 (SB1027) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and Expansion Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
HB1359 (SB0903) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School Auditorium Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0095 (HB0982) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Chesapeake Shakespeare Company's Downtown Theatre Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0308 (HB0582) Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Patricia and Arthur Modell Performing Arts Center at the Lyric Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
SB0445 Public Safety - Handgun Permits - Requirements and Limitations Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 (HB0609) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Olney Theatre Center Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0641 (HB1085) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0866 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Charles County - Indian Head Center for the Arts Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0903 (HB1359) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2005 - Montgomery County - Old Blair High School Auditorium Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB1372/CH0430) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1027 (HB1226) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Metropolitan Ballet Theatre Relocation and Expansion Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM