Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theaters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 /CH0583 (SB0352/CH0584)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters PG 302-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 /CH0638 (SB0952/CH0639)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater Licenses - Seating Capacity
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0509 (SB0157)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Valderrama
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0955/CH0768)
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347 /CH0737
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 (SB0709)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157 (HB0509)
Title
Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0352 /CH0584 (HB0185/CH0583)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0709 (HB1415)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0952 /CH0639 (HB0353/CH0638)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater Licenses - Seating Capacity
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0955 /CH0768 (HB1335)
Title
Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336)
Title
Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0185 /CH0583 (SB0352/CH0584) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters PG 302-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0353 /CH0638 (SB0952/CH0639) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater Licenses - Seating Capacity Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0369 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Drive-In Movies and Roller Skating Rinks Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0509 (SB0157) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1192 /CH0336 (SB1014/CH0337) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Delegate Valderrama 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 (SB0955/CH0768) Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019 Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1347 /CH0737 Prior Authorizations of State Debt – Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2019 - 12:45 PM
HB1415 (SB0709) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0157 (HB0509) Labor and Employment - Overtime Exemption - Service Advisors Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/07/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0285 /CH0580 (HB0109/CH0579) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Senator Kagan 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 580
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Economic Matters
SB0352 /CH0584 (HB0185/CH0583) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class BLX License for Movie Theaters Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0360 Income Tax - Theatrical Production Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0709 (HB1415) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Ticket Website Domain Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0952 /CH0639 (HB0353/CH0638) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Theater Licenses - Seating Capacity Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 639
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0955 /CH0768 (HB1335) Kent County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2019 Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/03/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 /CH0337 (HB1192/CH0336) Assembly Areas - State-Funded Construction or Renovation - Assisted Listening System Requirement Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM