Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0156 (SB0191)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0326 (SB0333)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0531
Title
Criminal Law - Mail Theft - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727
Title
Criminal Defendants - Citations - Theft
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0742 /CH0386 (SB0991)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0301 (SB0624/CH0300)
Title
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1077
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or Stolen
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
Public Safety - Firearms - Reporting Loss or Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1125 (SB0388)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1396 /CH0415
Title
Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492 (SB0387)
Title
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable Children
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0191 (HB0156)
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294)
Title
Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0333 (HB0326)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB1492)
Title
Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable Children
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB1125)
Title
Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0540
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or Stolen
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0300 (HB0942/CH0301)
Title
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Courts - Civil Action for Embezzlement by Employee
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0991 (HB0742/CH0386)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0156 (SB0191) Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Repeal Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0326 (SB0333) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0531 Criminal Law - Mail Theft - Penalty Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 Criminal Defendants - Citations - Theft Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0742 /CH0386 (SB0991) Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 386
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0866 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 /CH0651 (SB0791) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 651
Judiciary
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0942 /CH0301 (SB0624/CH0300) Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records Delegate Lee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1077 Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or Stolen Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1092 Public Safety - Firearms - Reporting Loss or Theft Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1125 (SB0388) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1396 /CH0415 Criminal Law - Theft-Related Crimes - Penalties Delegate Conaway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 415
Judiciary
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 (SB0387) Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable Children Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0191 (HB0156) Criminal Law - Theft of Wheeled Cart - Penalty Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0281 /CH0427 (HB0294) Firearm Safety Act of 2013 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0333 (HB0326) Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB1492) Crimes - Identification Theft - Vulnerable Children Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB1125) Victims of Crime - Identity Theft Passport - Children Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0540 Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Reporting Lost or Stolen Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 /CH0300 (HB0942/CH0301) Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records Senator Pugh 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0791 (HB0916/CH0651) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0816 Courts - Civil Action for Embezzlement by Employee Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0991 (HB0742/CH0386) Criminal Procedure - Citation Authority Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM