Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0060
Title
Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0810
Title
Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0866)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560)
Title
State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB1208)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0060 Repeal of the Firearm Safety Act of 2013 Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0810 Crimes - Exploitation of Vulnerable Adults - Breach of Fiduciary Duty Delegate Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0908 /CH0560 (SB0849/CH0559) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Delegate Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 560
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0866) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0849 /CH0559 (HB0908/CH0560) State Board of Nursing - Nurses, Nursing Assistants, Medication Technicians, and Electrologists - Licensing, Certification, Regulation, Violations, and Penalties Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 (HB1208) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1048 Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM