Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0306
Title
Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0557
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239
Title
Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129
Title
Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305
Title
Crimes - Theft of Scrap Metal
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0306 Firearm Decriminalization Act of 2015 Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0557 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Wheeled Devices and Metal Piping Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0737 /CH0337 (SB0288/CH0336) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 337
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1239 Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft - Repeal Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0129 Criminal Law - Desecration of Human Remains - Penalty Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0288 /CH0336 (HB0737/CH0337) Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0305 Crimes - Theft of Scrap Metal Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM