Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0190 (SB0508/CH0679)
Title
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0903)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0523 /CH0107
Title
E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized Charges
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0956)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111
Title
Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 (SB0949)
Title
Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 /CH0679 (HB0190)
Title
Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0615
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732
Title
Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0903 (HB0519)
Title
Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 (HB1362)
Title
Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0190 (SB0508/CH0679) Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Judiciary
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0519 (SB0903) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0523 /CH0107 E-ZPass Accounts - Transponder Theft - Reporting and Unauthorized Charges Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 107
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0953 (SB0956) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1111 Notary Public - Electronic and Remote Notary Services Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB1362 (SB0949) Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0508 /CH0679 (HB0190) Civil Remedies for Shoplifting and Employee Theft Senator Ramirez 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 679
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0615 Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 Civil Penalties for Shoplifting and Employee Theft Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0761 Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0903 (HB0519) Courts - Statute of Limitations - Civil Actions Arising Out of Human Rights Abuses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 (HB1362) Crimes - Robbery, Burglary, or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB0953) Natural Resources - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM