Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Criminal Law - Trespass With Intent to Commit Theft of Package
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956
Title
Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1025 (SB0932)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Delegate Sanchez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm - Penalty
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908
Title
Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0932 (HB1025)
Title
State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1209 (HB1158)
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0676 Criminal Law - Trespass With Intent to Commit Theft of Package Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 Civil Action - Offense Against Vulnerable or Elderly Adult Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1025 (SB0932) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Delegate Sanchez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1184 Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm - Penalty Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0908 Partial Repeal of Firearms Safety Act of 2013 Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0932 (HB1025) State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission - Video Lottery Facilities - Regulations Relating to Cheating Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB1209 (HB1158) Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM
Click to return on the top page