Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 (SB0887)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0782 (SB0691)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1038
Title
Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 (HB0782)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0887 (HB0146)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 (SB0887) Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0722 Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0782 (SB0691) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1038 Insurance - Guaranteed Automobile Protection - Liability Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
SB0691 (HB0782) Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2019) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0887 (HB0146) Motor Vehicles - Duplicate Driver's Licenses - Victims of Robbery or Theft Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM