Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Theft -see also- Shoplifting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 (SB0385)
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633
Title
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166
Title
Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0385 (HB0446)
Title
Organized Retail Theft
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626 (HB0139)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0713
Title
Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 (SB0385) Organized Retail Theft Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0633 Gun Theft Felony Act of 2021 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0166 Criminal Procedure - Police Officers - Duty to Report Misconduct (Maryland Police Accountability Act) Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0327 Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0385 (HB0446) Organized Retail Theft Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0560 Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 (HB0139) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force, Reporting, and Whistleblower Protections Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/04/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0713 Election Law – Theft or Destruction of Campaign Signs – Penalties Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 11:05 AM
Click to return on the top page