Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480
Title
Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003 (SJ0005/JR0001)
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841)
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993
Title
Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer and Correctional Officer
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0005 /JR0001 (HJ0003)
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0480 Criminal Law - Harassment - Misuse of Interactive Computer Service Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0828 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1415 /CH0841 (SB0858/CH0842) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Delegate Anderson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 841
Economic Matters
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HJ0003 (SJ0005/JR0001) Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/10/2017 - 11:30 AM
Budget and Taxation
SB0858 /CH0842 (HB1415/CH0841) Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Indirect Purchasers Senator Smith 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 842
Finance
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0993 Criminal Law - Threat Against State or Local Official - Law Enforcement Officer and Correctional Officer Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SJ0005 /JR0001 (HJ0003) Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017 Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM