Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Threats -see also- Harrassment; Violence

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0023
Title
Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and Drills
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 (SB0671)
Title
Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838 (SB0584)
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 (SB0881)
Title
Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 /CH0250
Title
Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1611
Title
Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1695
Title
Crimes – Hate Crimes – Defacement
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1698
Title
Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1720
Title
Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1807 (SB1250)
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1811
Title
Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and Oversight
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1816 (SB1257)
Title
Safe Schools Act of 2018
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB0838)
Title
Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 (HB0246)
Title
Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 /CH0366
Title
Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0769 /CH0365
Title
Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 (HB1276)
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281)
Title
General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1250 (HB1807)
Title
Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1257 (HB1816)
Title
Safe Schools Act of 2018
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1263
Title
Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation)
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1265 /CH0030
Title
Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0023 Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and Drills Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/01/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0246 (SB0671) Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 (SB0584) Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0874 /CH0281 (SB0892) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/19/2018 - 3:00 PM
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB1276 (SB0881) Criminal Law – Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 /CH0250 Public Safety – Extreme Risk Protective Orders Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Judiciary
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
HB1611 Courts - Concealment of Public Hazard and Sexual Harassment (Sunshine in Litigation Act) Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1695 Crimes – Hate Crimes – Defacement Delegate Chang 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1698 Education - Life Changing Experiences School Program - Established Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1720 Public Schools - Student Discipline - Suspension and Expulsion and Policies Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1807 (SB1250) Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence and Deadly Weapons on Public School Property Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1811 Education - Threat Assessment Teams - Establishment and Oversight Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1816 (SB1257) Safe Schools Act of 2018 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0122 Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0584 (HB0838) Child Protection - Reporting - Threat of Harm Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0671 (HB0246) Hate Crimes - Threats and Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 /CH0366 Bullying, Cyberbullying, Harassment, and Intimidation – School Response Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0769 /CH0365 Criminal Law - Sextortion and Revenge Porn Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 365
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 (HB1276) Criminal Law - Human Trafficking and Prostitution Offenses Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0892 (HB0874/CH0281) General Assembly - Department of Legislative Services - Reorganization and Duties President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Rules
3/15/2018 - 11:00 AM
SB0904 Public Schools – Social Media Use by Educators Senator Waugh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1250 (HB1807) Criminal Law – Threat of Mass Violence Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/04/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1257 (HB1816) Safe Schools Act of 2018 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB1263 Public Safety – School Mental Health Services and Mental Disorder Weapon Restraining Order (School Safety Act of 2018: Anticipation) Senator Waugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 11:30 a.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2018 - 11:30 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB1265 /CH0030 Maryland Safe to Learn Act of 2018 Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM