Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Time

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0220)
Title
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0421
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
State Government - Commemorative Days - Earth Hour
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1476
Title
Gas and Electric Companies - Consumer Relations - Missed Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0104
Title
Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0207
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0220 (HB0117)
Title
Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed Appointments
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0117 (SB0220) Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed Appointments Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0421 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 State Government - Commemorative Days - Earth Hour Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1476 Gas and Electric Companies - Consumer Relations - Missed Appointments Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0104 Family Law - Grounds for Absolute Divorce - Time Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0207 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 11:30 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0220 (HB0117) Consumer Protection - Television Service Providers - Missed Appointments Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM