Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Time

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0159
Title
Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services Providers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 (SB0455)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0123)
Title
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule
Sponsor
Delegate Aumann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 /CH0421 (SB0497)
Title
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0688)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1018
Title
Election Law - Early Voting Centers and Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081
Title
Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123 (HB0407)
Title
Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0275
Title
Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623)
Title
Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0455 (HB0389)
Title
Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB0452/CH0421)
Title
Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0969)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0159 Special Education - Standards and Workload Guidelines for Teachers and Related Services Providers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 (SB0455) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0407 (SB0123) Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule Delegate Aumann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0452 /CH0421 (SB0497) Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 421
Ways and Means
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0623 (SB0418/CH0030) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Delegate Miele 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0969 (SB0688) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1018 Election Law - Early Voting Centers and Polling Places - Waiting Times to Vote Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 Education - Orange Ribbon for Healthy School Hours - Establishment Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0123 (HB0407) Baltimore County - Public High Schools - Adoption of School Schedule Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0275 Transportation - Thomas J. Hatem Memorial Bridge - Discounted Variable Toll Rate for Commuters Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 /CH0030 (HB0623) Estates - Modified Administration - Final Report and Distribution - Extension Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0455 (HB0389) Education - Beginning of School Year - After Labor Day Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0497 (HB0452/CH0421) Commission to Review Maryland's Use of Assessments and Testing in Public Schools Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 (HB0969) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM