Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518
Title
Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0485)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0725 (SB0025/CH0167)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0025 /CH0167 (HB0725)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0485 (HB0721)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Conversions
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0518 Tax Sales - Redemption of Property - Payments and Fees Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0485) Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0725 (SB0025/CH0167) Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse Delegate McMillan 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:15 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1140 /CH0528 (SB0697/CH0527) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Economic Matters
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0025 /CH0167 (HB0725) Vehicle Laws - Title and Registration - Transfer to Surviving Spouse Senator Forehand 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2013 - 1:30 PM
Environmental Matters
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 Motor Vehicle Administration - Fee-Setting Authority - Miscellaneous Fees Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0485 (HB0721) Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax Exemptions - Leased Vehicles Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Senator Stone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 /CH0527 (HB1140/CH0528) Corporations and Associations - Conversions Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM