Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540
Title
Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0319 (SB0624/CH0318)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395)
Title
Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0318 (HB0679/CH0319)
Title
Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773
Title
Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351)
Title
Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0205 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0344 /CH0395 (SB0344) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Economic Matters
3/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0540 Motor Vehicles - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Titling for Nonresidents Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0319 (SB0624/CH0318) Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1082 /CH0351 (SB0881/CH0350) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Economic Matters
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0172 /CH0464 (HB0162) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2014 President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0344 (HB0344/CH0395) Charles County - Sunday Car Sales Blue Law Exemption - Enabling Authority Senator Middleton 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0624 /CH0318 (HB0679/CH0319) Insurance - Title Insurers - Title Insurance Commitment and Binders Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 318
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0773 Automated Motor Vehicles - Titling, Registration, and Rules of the Road Senator Ferguson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0881 /CH0350 (HB1082/CH0351) Title Insurers - Statutory or Unearned Premium Reserves Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Finance
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM