Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0492 /CH0684
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0031 /CH0038
Title
Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040 /CH0041
Title
Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0492 /CH0684 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0031 /CH0038 Title Insurance - Rate Making - Use of Rating Organizations for Filings Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 38
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 /CH0041 Title Insurance Producers - Licensing of Business Entities and On-Site Reviews Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
Finance
1/12/2017 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM