Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 /CH0512 (SB0768)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0292 /CH0551
Title
Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB1065/CH0512)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1145
Title
County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1065 /CH0512 (SB0768) Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0292 /CH0551 Estates - Administration Exemption - Transfer of Motor Vehicle and Boat Titles Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 551
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0768 (HB1065/CH0512) Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1145 County Boards of Education - Leasing of School Property Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:45 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2018 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM