Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227
Title
Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0730
Title
Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1302 (SB0255)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0084 /CH0140
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0095 /CH0261
Title
Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566)
Title
State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557)
Title
Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0287
Title
Motor Vehicles - Temporary In-Transit Registration
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0020 /CH0566 (SB0344/CH0567) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Ways and Means
1/17/2019 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0054 Natural Resources - Lands Formed by Excavation Materials - Transfer of Authority Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB0227 Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0554 (SB0710/CH0555) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 554
Environment and Transportation
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1071 Transportation - Vehicle Titling Fee and Vehicle Excise Tax - Active Duty Members of the Military Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1209 /CH0730 Property Tax - Collection of Unpaid Taxes and Tax Sales Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 730
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1302 (SB0255) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Economic Matters
SB0084 /CH0140 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Application - Signature Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0095 /CH0261 Natural Resources – Recreational License Donation Program and Fund – Program Extension and Fund Name Change Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 /CH0567 (HB0020/CH0566) State Agricultural Land Transfer Tax – Alteration of Nonagricultural Use Reduction and Exemptions Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 /CH0276 (HB0557) Property Tax – In Rem Foreclosure and Sale – Vacant and Abandoned Property Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0287 Motor Vehicles - Temporary In-Transit Registration Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2019 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0710 /CH0555 (HB0993/CH0554) Anne Arundel County – Ethics – Contributions and Participation in Development Applications Anne Arundel County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 555
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1021 Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Electronic Collection and Remission of Vehicle Excise Taxes Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM