Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Titles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0998)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0241 /CH0124 (SB0170/CH0125)
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0271 /CH0146
Title
Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021)
Title
Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1149 (SB1013)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385
Title
Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1479 /CH0480
Title
Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028)
Title
Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0170 /CH0125 (HB0241/CH0124)
Title
Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0650
Title
Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle Titles and Registrations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441)
Title
Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0998 (HB0055)
Title
Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1013 (HB1149)
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270)
Title
Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0021 /CH0028 (SB0088/CH0029) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Delegate Cardin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Economic Matters
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0055 (SB0998) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
1/29/2020 - 2:00 PM
HB0241 /CH0124 (SB0170/CH0125) Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 124
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0271 /CH0146 Vehicle Laws - Certificate of Title Fee - Trailer Gifted to Family Member Delegate Szeliga 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 146
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0444 Homeowners Associations - Powers, Boards of Directors, Voting, Meetings, and Rules Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0600 /CH0270 (SB1021) Baltimore County – Motorcycles – Sunday Sales Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 270
Economic Matters
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1033 /CH0411 (SB0778/CH0412) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Delegate Stein 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 411
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1149 (SB1013) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1182 /CH0441 (SB0806/CH0442) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Delegate Smith 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 441
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1385 Town of Mount Airy (Carroll County and Frederick County) - Urban Renewal Authority Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1479 /CH0480 Calvert County - Subdivision Plats - Stormwater Management Easements Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0088 /CH0029 (HB0021/CH0028) Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
1/09/2020 - 2:15 PM
Economic Matters
SB0170 /CH0125 (HB0241/CH0124) Real Property - Ground Leases - Past Due Ground Rent Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 125
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0650 Vehicle Laws - Title Service Agents - Out-of-State Vehicle Titles and Registrations Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0778 /CH0412 (HB1033/CH0411) Vehicle Laws - Liens - Electronic Recording Senator Ready 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 412
Finance
2/19/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0806 /CH0442 (HB1182/CH0441) Real Property - Redemption or Extinguishment of Ground Rents Senator Hayes 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 442
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2020 - 12:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0998 (HB0055) Vessels - Certificate of Title - Transfer-on-Death Beneficiary Designation Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1013 (HB1149) Department of Housing and Community Development - Social Housing Subprogram (Social Housing Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1021 (HB0600/CH0270) Baltimore County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/1/2020 2:27 PM