Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147
Title
Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182 /CH0086 (SB0098)
Title
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660 (SB0827)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676
Title
Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0683 (SB0700)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0684
Title
Tobacco-Free Schools Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 (SB0708)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270
Title
Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365 (SB0823)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 /CH0174
Title
Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0182/CH0086)
Title
Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB0683)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708 (HB0948)
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0823 (HB1365)
Title
Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0827 (HB0660)
Title
Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Garagiola
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 Contraband Tobacco Products and Conveyances - Seizure and Disposition Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0182 /CH0086 (SB0098) Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Economic Matters
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 (SB0827) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Delegate Davis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 Montgomery County - Nuisances in Multidwelling Buildings - Private Right of Action MC 10-13 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0683 (SB0700) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0684 Tobacco-Free Schools Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0948 (SB0708) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1270 Health Care Facilities and Pharmacies - Sale of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 (SB0823) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0069 /CH0174 Tobacco Products - Tobacco Tax - Exemptions and Penalties Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0098 (HB0182/CH0086) Business Regulation - Other Tobacco Products - Wholesalers - License Fee Exception for Cigarette Subwholesalers Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
1/24/2013 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0700 (HB0683) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Finance
SB0708 (HB0948) Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
SB0823 (HB1365) Pipe Tobacco and Premium Cigars - Direct Sale and Shipment to Consumers Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0827 (HB0660) Streamlined Tax Administration Act of 2013 Senator Garagiola 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM