Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478
Title
Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585 /CH0438
Title
Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865 (SB0140)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1015
Title
Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0140 (HB0865)
Title
Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0229
Title
Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0815
Title
Anne Arundel County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0478 Labor and Employment - Discrimination Based on the Use of Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0585 /CH0438 Maryland-National Capital Park and Planning Commission - Regulations to Prohibit Smoking MC/PG 109-15 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 (SB0140) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1015 Public Health - Responsible Tobacco Retailing Act of 2015 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0140 (HB0865) Kent County - Tobacco Products Offenses - Citations Issued by Alcoholic Beverages Inspectors Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0229 Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties Calvert County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0815 Anne Arundel County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM