Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953 (SB0456)
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 /CH0785
Title
Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1737 (SB1266)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1752
Title
Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Health Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199)
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254
Title
Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0953)
Title
Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1266 (HB1737)
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 /CH0199 (SB0090/CH0200) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 199
Economic Matters
1/24/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0953 (SB0456) Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Delegate Morales 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1094 /CH0785 Distribution of Electronic Cigarettes to Minors - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 785
Economic Matters
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1737 (SB1266) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1752 Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Health Insurance Coverage Delegate Hayes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0090 /CH0200 (HB0047/CH0199) Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems Licenses – Modifications Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Finance
1/17/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0254 Public Health - Tobacco Control Funding Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
SB0456 (HB0953) Tobacco Products - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1266 (HB1737) Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM