Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tobacco

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0496
Title
Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703)
Title
Alcohol and Tobacco Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Miller
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217 (SB0497)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291 (SB0826)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1295
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 /CH0735 (SB0728)
Title
Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Tobacco Products and Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Minimum Age and Civil Fines
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0497 (HB1217)
Title
Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0687
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibition of Donations to Regulators
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012)
Title
Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0826 (HB1291)
Title
Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396)
Title
Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0496 Department of the Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Environmental Hazards Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1052 /CH0012 (SB0703) Alcohol and Tobacco Commission Delegate Miller 4 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 12
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1169 /CH0396 (SB0895) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Economic Matters
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Finance
HB1217 (SB0497) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1291 (SB0826) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1295 Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1301 /CH0735 (SB0728) Taxation of Online Sales – Marketplace Facilitators and Sellers of Other Tobacco Products Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 735
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0378 Tobacco Products and Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Minimum Age and Civil Fines Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Finance
Judicial Proceedings
SB0497 (HB1217) Pharmacists - Aids for the Cessation of Tobacco Product Use - Prescribing and Dispensing Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0687 Alcoholic Beverages - Prohibition of Donations to Regulators Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0703 (HB1052/CH0012) Alcohol, Tobacco, and Motor Fuel Commission Senator Kramer 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0826 (HB1291) Tobacco Tax - Premium Cigars - Exemption Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0895 (HB1169/CH0396) Business Regulation - Tobacco Products and Electronic Smoking Devices - Revisions Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM