Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Toilets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0133
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0539 /CH0368
Title
Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244)
Title
Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534
Title
Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0133 Public Schools - Provision of Feminine Hygiene Products Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0539 /CH0368 Environment - Reuse of Water Diverted From Septic Systems Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 368
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1244 (SB0330/CH0523) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0330 /CH0523 (HB1244) Public Buildings – Diaper–Changing Facilities Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 523
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0534 Public Buildings and Places of Public Accommodation - Diaper-Changing Facilities in Restrooms Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM