Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Toilets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009
Title
Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0208
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147 (SB0401)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292 (SB1019)
Title
Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1298 (SB0791)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Cain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 (HB0010)
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 (HB1147)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1298)
Title
County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019 (HB1292)
Title
Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 Maryland Horse Industry Board - Breeding Stables and Horse Establishments - Definitions Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0208 Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 (SB0401) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1292 (SB1019) Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1298 (SB0791) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Delegate Cain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 (HB0010) Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2020 - 3:00 PM
SB0401 (HB1147) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Single-Occupancy Public Restrooms - Availability (The Accessible to All Act) Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2020 - 12:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0791 (HB1298) County Boards of Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 (HB1292) Public Schools - Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 1:59 PM