Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0452 (SB0562)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance Compact
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0568 (SB0544)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0809
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1271 (SB0987)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership
Sponsor
Delegate Cluster
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1305
Title
Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147)
Title
Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts
Sponsor
Montgomery County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0326
Title
Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 (HB0568)
Title
Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0452)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB1271)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0147 (SB0299/CH0482) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts MC 13-14 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0183 (SB0558/CH0303) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0452 (SB0562) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 Maryland Intrastate Hospital Assistance Compact Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0568 (SB0544) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0809 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Damages Sustained on Artificial or Synthetic Turf Playing Fields Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1271 (SB0987) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Environmental Matters
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1274 Correctional Services - Baltimore City Detention Center - Transfer of Ownership Delegate Cluster 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1305 Unincorporated Nonprofit Associations - Members and Officers - Personal Liability Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0299 /CH0482 (HB0147) Montgomery County - Maryland Tort Claims Act - Human Services Torts Montgomery County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 482
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0326 Elected Officials - Civil Cases - Liability for Costs, Judgments, and Settlements (Taxpayer Protection Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0544 (HB0568) Civil Actions - Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0558 /CH0303 (HB0183) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Industrial Development Authority Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0452) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Judgments - Third-Party Tortfeasors Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0689 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Repeal of Certain Notice Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 (HB1271) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM