Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0357 /CH0101 (SB0883)
Title
Frederick County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice of Claim
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0393 (SB0362)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722)
Title
Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 /CH0623 (SB0935)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0637 /CH0624 (SB0934)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0856
Title
State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1640 (SB1167)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0215
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Statute of Limitations and Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362 (HB0393)
Title
Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 (HB0357/CH0101)
Title
Frederick County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice of Claim
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0934 (HB0637/CH0624)
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0935 (HB0636/CH0623)
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1097 /CH0466
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Regional Development Councils
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1167 (HB1640)
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0357 /CH0101 (SB0883) Frederick County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice of Claim Delegate Afzali 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 101
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0393 (SB0362) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0535 /CH0721 (SB0734/CH0722) Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Structured Settlements - Transfers and Registration of Structured Settlement Transferees Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 721
Judiciary
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0636 /CH0623 (SB0935) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement - Exception Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 623
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0637 /CH0624 (SB0934) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement - Exception Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 624
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0856 State and Local Police Officers - Liability Insurance - Required Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1640 (SB1167) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act Carroll County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0215 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Nolle Prosequi Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0356 Local Government Tort Claims Act and Maryland Tort Claims Act - Statute of Limitations and Notice Requirements Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - House Refuses to Recede
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 (HB0393) Award of Attorney's Fees and Expenses - Violation of Maryland Constitutional Right Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0883 (HB0357/CH0101) Frederick County - Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice of Claim Senator Hough 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0934 (HB0637/CH0624) Local Government Tort Claims Act - Notice Requirement Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0935 (HB0636/CH0623) Maryland Tort Claims Act - Certain Claim Requirement Senator Manno 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/11/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB1097 /CH0466 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Regional Development Councils Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1167 (HB1640) Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act Senator Ready 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM