Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071
Title
Courts - Business and Technology Court
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1270 (SB1042)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554
Title
Maryland Tort Claims Act - Immunity - Persons Acting on Behalf of the State
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1042 (HB1270)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1071 Courts - Business and Technology Court Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1270 (SB1042) Access to Maryland Courts Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 Maryland Tort Claims Act - Immunity - Persons Acting on Behalf of the State Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1042 (HB1270) Access to Maryland Courts Act Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM