Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Torts -see also- Libel and Slander; Med Malp; Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limits of Liability
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0818 (SB0629)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0101 /CH0748
Title
Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0818)
Title
Access to Maryland Courts Act
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0832
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limits of Liability
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0556 Maryland Transit Administration - Limits of Liability Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2019 - 11:00 AM
HB0818 (SB0629) Access to Maryland Courts Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 11:30 a.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2019 - 11:30 AM
SB0101 /CH0748 Civil Actions - Prelitigation Discovery of Insurance Coverage Senator Zirkin 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 748
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0629 (HB0818) Access to Maryland Courts Act Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0832 Maryland Transit Administration - Limits of Liability Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2019 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM