Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 /CH0530 (SB0702/CH0529)
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1395
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsor
Delegate James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 /CH0529 (HB1337/CH0530)
Title
Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1337 /CH0530 (SB0702/CH0529) Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects Delegate Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 530
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1395 Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax Delegate James 2 2 In the House - Recommitted to Ways and Means (Delegate Hixson)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 /CH0529 (HB1337/CH0530) Maryland Public Art Initiative Program - Selection of Art for Capital Projects Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 529
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM