Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0505 /CH0261 (SB0087/CH0260)
Title
Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964 (SB0702)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1555
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Service
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0087 /CH0260 (HB0505/CH0261)
Title
Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB0964)
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0505 /CH0261 (SB0087/CH0260) Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights Delegate McMillan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Economic Matters
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 (SB0702) Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Economic Matters
HB1547 (SB0817/CH0531) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Cecil County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1555 Alcoholic Beverages - Distilleries - Service Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0087 /CH0260 (HB0505/CH0261) Maryland Tourism Development Board - Destination Marketing Organization Officials - Voting Rights Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Finance
1/17/2017 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
SB0702 (HB0964) Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0716 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism and Promotion of Agricultural Products Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 /CH0531 (HB1547) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM