Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0672
Title
Land Use - Agritourism
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0549
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 /CH0197
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1116 /CH0493 (SB1152)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1120
Title
Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1141 /CH0241
Title
Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 (SB0956)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1675 (SB1219)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1772 (SB1206/CH0854)
Title
Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1781
Title
Land Use – Change to Zoning Classification – Limitation
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 (HB0895)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hancock's Resolution Visitor Center and Barn
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652 /CH0198
Title
Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1370)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641)
Title
Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1152 (HB1116/CH0493)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1219 (HB1675)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0252 /CH0672 Land Use - Agritourism Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 672
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0549 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0979 /CH0197 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Economic Matters
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1116 /CH0493 (SB1152) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 493
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1120 Land Use - Zoning - Agritourism Activities Delegate Rey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1141 /CH0241 Building Performance Standards - Agricultural Buildings Used for Agritourism - Exemption Delegate Jacobs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 (SB0956) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1385 /CH0641 (SB1085/CH0642) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 641
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1675 (SB1219) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 4:00 PM
HB1772 (SB1206/CH0854) Transportation – Pride of Baltimore II – Funding and Reporting Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1781 Land Use – Change to Zoning Classification – Limitation Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0334 (HB0895) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Hancock's Resolution Visitor Center and Barn Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 12:00 PM
SB0652 /CH0198 Property and Casualty Insurance - Travel Insurance - Regulation Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0956 (HB1370) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB1085 /CH0642 (HB1385/CH0641) Baltimore City - Tourism Improvement District Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 642
Finance
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1152 (HB1116/CH0493) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1219 (HB1675) Creation of a State Debt - Montgomery County - Rockville Welcome Center Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:57 PM