Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0508)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0446)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353 /CH0132
Title
Agriculture - Nuisance Insects
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1387 (SB0628)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0012 /CH0083
Title
Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034
Title
Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070)
Title
Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0446 (HB0518)
Title
Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0492
Title
Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0508 (HB0480)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB1387)
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0386 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations on Municipal Corporations - Agricultural Tourism Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0508) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 (SB0446) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0639 /CH0070 (SB0099/CH0071) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1353 /CH0132 Agriculture - Nuisance Insects Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 132
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1387 (SB0628) Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0012 /CH0083 Capital Projects - Inclusion of Public Art Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Finance
1/23/2019 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0034 Tourist Area and Corridor Program and Task Force on Attraction Signs Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0071 (HB0639/CH0070) Public Safety – Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0183 Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0446 (HB0518) Public Safety - Agritourism - Permit Exemption Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0492 Investment in Job Skills Act of 2019 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0508 (HB0480) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0628 (HB1387) Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM