Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Tourism

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0305
Title
Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335 (SB0432)
Title
Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0345 /CH0175 (SB0431/CH0174)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 /CH0331
Title
Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1441
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541 (SB0707)
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1598
Title
Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1659 (SB1076)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 /CH0501
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0431 /CH0174 (HB0345/CH0175)
Title
Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0432 (HB0335)
Title
Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Charles County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 (HB1541)
Title
Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1076 (HB1659)
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0305 Department of Agriculture - Maryland Made Promotion Fund Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 (SB0432) Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0345 /CH0175 (SB0431/CH0174) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts Charles County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 175
Ways and Means
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0805 /CH0331 Montgomery County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism MC 26-20 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 331
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1354 Sales and Use Tax and Personal Property Tax – Services, Aircraft Parts and Equipment, and Data Centers Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Ways and Means
3/02/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1441 Economic Development - Maryland Tourism Development Board - Grants Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1541 (SB0707) Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1598 Washington County - Hotel Rental Tax - Rate and Distribution of Revenue Delegate Corderman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1659 (SB1076) Maryland Stadium Authority – Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Michael Erin Busch Sports Fund Delegate McIntosh 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Appropriations
3/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0023 /CH0501 Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 501
Finance
1/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/16/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0431 /CH0174 (HB0345/CH0175) Charles County - Tax Increment Financing and Special Taxing Districts Charles County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 174
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0432 (HB0335) Charles County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Charles County Senators 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0707 (HB1541) Task Force on the Tourism Industry in Maryland Senator Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
2/28/2020 - 12:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB1076 (HB1659) Maryland Stadium Authority - Youth and Amateur Sports Grants Program and Fund Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/8/2020 1:50 PM