Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0987)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0886
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255
Title
Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow Truck
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303)
Title
Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB0781/CH0388)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0781 /CH0388 (SB0987) Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 388
Environmental Matters
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0886 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/01/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0303 (SB0634/CH0302) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 303
Economic Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 Motor Vehicles - Towing Services - Licensing Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle on Approach of Tow Truck Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0634 /CH0302 (HB1127/CH0303) Commercial Law - Self-Service Storage Facilities Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 302
Finance
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0987 (HB0781/CH0388) Vehicle Laws - Towing or Removal of Vehicles - Notice Senator Forehand 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM