Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436 /CH0406 (SB0003)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Murphy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Winter Driving Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment
Sponsor
Delegate Minnick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0436/CH0406)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0436 /CH0406 (SB0003) Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Environmental Matters
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0678 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Murphy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Winter Driving Safety Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1467 Vehicle Laws - Towing, Recovery, and Storage - Methods of Payment Delegate Minnick 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0003 (HB0436/CH0406) Vehicle Laws - Operation of Vehicle When Approaching a Tow Truck Senator Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM