Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348 (SB0041)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0839
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284 (SB0627)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0041 (HB0348)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB1284)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0348 (SB0041) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0839 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0848 Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 (SB0627) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0041 (HB0348) Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB1284) Vehicle Laws - Dangerous Accumulations of Snow and Ice - Removal From Exposed Vehicle Surfaces Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM