Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0036 (SB0302)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0889 /CH0748
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320 /CH0735
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1455
Title
Highway Parking - Prohibition Against Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0036)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0036 (SB0302) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2017 - 2:00 PM
HB0889 /CH0748 Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Tow Trucks Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 748
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 /CH0735 Southern Maryland Code Counties - Towing Companies - Authority to Regulate Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 735
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1455 Highway Parking - Prohibition Against Prolonged Parking of Inoperable or Disabled Vehicle Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0302 (HB0036) Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM