Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Towing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 (SB0125)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0162
Title
Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles from Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1505
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1587
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 (HB0118)
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0474
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0118 (SB0125) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0162 Transportation - Potomac River Bridges Towing Compact - Inclusion of Additional Bridges Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 Driving Under the Influence of Alcohol - Subsequent Offenders - Mandatory Ignition Interlock Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Towing or Removal of Vehicles from Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1505 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1587 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0125 (HB0118) Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/05/2020 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0392 Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2020 - 12:00 PM
SB0474 Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2020 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 2/14/2020 11:07 AM