Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Trade Secrets

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0412)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0084)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Senator Hester
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1251)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0412) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1251 (SB0805) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0412 (HB0084) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Senator Hester 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0805 (HB1251) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/16/2021 1:12 PM
Click to return on the top page