Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 /CH0233
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711
Title
Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds Vote
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1402
Title
Agricultural Transfer Tax - Distribution to Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0106 /CH0129
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0595 /CH0233 Real Property - Foreclosure of Residential Property - Certified Community Development Financial Institutions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 233
Environmental Matters
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0711 Transfer Tax Revenues - Special Fund Transfers - Two-Thirds Vote Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1402 Agricultural Transfer Tax - Distribution to Mel Noland Woodland Incentives Fund Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0106 /CH0129 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Business Entities - Reorganizations - Exemption Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Budget and Taxation
1/22/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM