Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0621
Title
Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383)
Title
Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0789
Title
Tax Procedure - Assessments, Penalties, and Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 /CH0373 (SB0306/CH0372)
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464 (SB0927)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0306 /CH0372 (HB0833/CH0373)
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 (HB0462/CH0010)
Title
State Transfer Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1464)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0044 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0621 Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0462 /CH0010 (SB0383) Program Open Space - Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0789 Tax Procedure - Assessments, Penalties, and Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 /CH0373 (SB0306/CH0372) Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1085 Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1464 (SB0927) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0306 /CH0372 (HB0833/CH0373) Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Calculation Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 372
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0383 (HB0462/CH0010) State Transfer Tax - Distribution of Revenue President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1464) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM