Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transfer Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0469 /CH0538
Title
Recordation and Transfer Tax - Principal Residence Surrendered in Bankruptcy - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1604 /CH0148
Title
Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Law Enforcement Officers and Fire and Rescue Services Members Ho. Co. 17-17
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0363 /CH0064 (SB0111/CH0063) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0469 /CH0538 Recordation and Transfer Tax - Principal Residence Surrendered in Bankruptcy - Exemption Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 538
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1604 /CH0148 Howard County - Transfer Tax Exemption and Rate Reduction - Law Enforcement Officers and Fire and Rescue Services Members Ho. Co. 17-17 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Ways and Means
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0111 /CH0063 (HB0363/CH0064) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Budget and Taxation
2/01/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM